WY SF0026 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; appropriating continuing and one-time funds to the emergency fire suppression account; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fire suppression account appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2019-02-22 | House | Did not consider in CoW |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-15 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-15 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-19 | Bill Number Assigned |