WY SF0024 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to community based in-home services for seniors and persons with disabilities; amending eligibility criteria; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Community based in-home services.
Sponsors
Sen. Floyd Esquibel [D] | Rep. Ken Esquibel [D] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Marty Martin [D] |
Rep. Lori Millin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0019 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0019 | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0019 | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-23 | (H10) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Number Assigned |