WY SF0022 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 5 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to prioritization of municipal solid waste facilities remediation projects; authorizing expenditure of previously appropriated funds; establishing a prioritized list of projects; authorizing the department of environmental quality limited discretionary authority to modify the prioritized list; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landfill remediation priority list.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-12 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25 Chapter No. 5 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-02-25 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-02-25 Governor Signed SEA No. 0002
2015-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0002
2015-02-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0002
2015-02-12 Assigned Number SEA No. 0002
2015-02-12House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2015-02-11House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-10HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-09HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-09 Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2015-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-01-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-14SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-14 Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-12-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback