WY SF0019 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to predator control; establishing voting rights for predator management district meetings; amending time limits for issuing predator animal control fee refunds; repealing archaic provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Predator management districts-management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA0024 | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0024 | |
2012-03-05 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0024 | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned Number SEA0024 | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-01 | (H05) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H05 | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-17 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-16 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-15 | (S05) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S05 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |