WY SF0018 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to county notice publications; amending requirements and contents for county notices and publications; providing for online publications; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties-legal publications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed SEA0017
2014-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0017
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0017
2014-02-28 Assigned Number SEA0017
2014-02-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-26HousePassed CoW
2014-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-24HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-19HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07
2014-02-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-14SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-13SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-13SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07
2014-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-12-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback