WY SF0017 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; providing for the transmission of electronic notices or documents related to property and casualty insurance and insurance policies; providing limitations; providing for posting of property and casualty insurance policies and endorsements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Insurance-electronic delivery of documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0054 | |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0054 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0054 |
2014-03-05 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0054 | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Did Concur |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed COW |
2014-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-27 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2014-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed COW |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-12-16 | Bill Number Assigned |