WY SF0015 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to involuntary commitments and emergency detentions; amending definitions as specified; specifying services that can be considered treatment; authorizing licensed psychologists to conduct examinations for the purpose of involuntary hospitalization proceedings; clarifying liability for costs of emergency detention; specifying responsibility for the transportation of a detainee, a patient and a discharged person under specified conditions; authorizing counties to establish a single point of responsibility for treatment of detainees; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title 25 revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-03 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-09 Governor Signed SEA No. 0035
2010-03-04 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0035
2010-03-04 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0035
2010-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0035
2010-03-03 (S) Did Concur
2010-03-03 (S) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-02 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-01 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-26 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-25 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-25 (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-23 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2010-02-23 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-22 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-19 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-18 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-17 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-17 (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-09 (S) Introduced and Referred to S10
2010-02-08 (S) Received for Introduction
2009-12-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback