WY SF0009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to special districts; exempting fire protection districts and water and sewer districts from the audit requirements of the Uniform Municipal Fiscal Procedures Act; amending oversight of districts as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Audit requirements for special fire and water districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Adopted SF0009JC001: 34-25-1-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Adopted SF0009JC001: 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Concur:Failed 3-27-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-4-4-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-4-4-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 184
2019-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0071
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0071
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0071
2019-02-27 Assigned Number SEA No. 0071
2019-02-20HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-15SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-14SenateConcur:Failed 3-27-0-0-0
2019-02-14SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-14House3rd Reading:Passed 52-4-4-0-0
2019-02-13House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-11HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-18Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2019-01-17Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-16SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-15SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback