WY SF0007 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to livestock; providing for brucellosis surveillance in an area of concern as designated by the livestock board; modifying the compensation provision accordingly; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Brucellosis surveillance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0015 | |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0015 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0015 |
2014-02-28 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0015 | |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed COW |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-25 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2014-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed COW |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-11-21 | Bill Number Assigned |