WY HJ0009 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION demanding Congress to cease and desist from enacting mandates that are beyond the enumerated powers granted to the Congress by the United States Constitution; and, to amend the tenth amendment and the interstate commerce clause in article 1, section 8 of the United States Constitution.
Title
Resolution to amend United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Governor Signed HEJR No. 0003 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed HEJR No. 0003 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0003 | |
2010-03-04 | Assigned Number HEJR No. 0003 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Did Concur | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-25 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-25 | (S07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2010-02-23 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |