WY HJ0006 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION rejecting the National Popular Vote Compact and calling on non-signatory states to similarly reject the compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reject National Popular Vote Compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseCOW:H Did not consider for COW
2020-02-19HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-19HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 54-5-1-0-0
2020-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback