WY HJ0005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to provide that for six years all state mineral royalties earned from the lease of state school lands may be appropriated by the legislature for the support of the public schools and providing a ballot statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lands mineral royalties-constitutional amendment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Housepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-25HouseH04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback