WY HB0316 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Controlled Substance Act; amending the procedure and requirements for forfeiting and seizing property; providing definitions; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Civil asset forfeiture reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-02-01 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-29 | Bill Number Assigned |