WY HB0294 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring the office of state lands and investments to study and prepare a proposed plan on the development of school trust land and other state trust lands as specified; requiring the office to solicit proposals as specified; requiring reports and a presentation of the plan; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State trust lands-studies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-17-3-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-15SenateS05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-02-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 40-17-3-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-3-0-0
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback