WY HB0280 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to wills, decedents' estates and probate code; modernizing terms relating to burial arrangements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Funeral service practitioners.
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Wilson [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 127 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0067 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0067 |
2019-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0067 |
2019-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0067 | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-31 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |