WY HB0252 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - 3rd Reading:Failed 20-38-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - 3rd Reading:Failed 20-38-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to management council membership; amending provisions relating to the selection of a member at large; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Management council membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 20-38-2-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 20-38-2-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2017-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-02 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-27 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |