WY HB0235 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to animals; modifying provisions governing the treatment of animals; modifying penalties; authorizing conditions a court may require as part of an order of protection in a domestic abuse case related to animal protection; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Care of animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0235JC002: 17-11-2-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0235JC002: 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Did Not Adopt HB0235JC001: 4-24-2-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0235JC001: 39-20-1-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 181
2019-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0126
2019-02-28SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0126
2019-02-28HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0126
2019-02-28 Assigned Number HEA No. 0126
2019-02-27SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-27HousePursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-25SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-25HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-25HouseConcur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0
2019-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-20SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-02-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-29HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0235.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Engross/HB0235.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Enroll/HB0235.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0235.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#-396
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#5257
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#-857
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#568
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#5431
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#5487
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#644
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#5505
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0235#655

Bill Comments

feedback