WY HB0235 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 156 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 156 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to foreign corporations and foreign limited liability partnerships; providing procedures for reinstatement of foreign corporations and limited liability partnerships as specified; providing for appeals; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Foreign business entities-reinstatement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 156 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0093 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0093 |
2015-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0093 |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0093 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-27 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-26 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-10 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2015-02-09 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-05 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-05 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-05 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-02 | Bill Number Assigned |