WY HB0233 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to anatomical gifts; providing for donor designations on hunting and fishing licenses; specifying duties of the game and fish commission and department; providing for release of donor information to procurement organizations; making conforming amendments; providing for recoupment of costs; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Organ donor designation on hunting and fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - H06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 1-8-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 41-16-3-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 41-16-3-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2020-02-26 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-02-19 | House | H06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 1-8-0-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 41-16-3-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |