WY HB0229 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sales and use taxes; clarifying that the department of revenue and county treasurers may collect sales and use taxes electronically; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electronic payment of sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Amendment adopted 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Amendment adopted 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 123 | |
2023-02-27 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0057 | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0057 |
2023-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0057 |
2023-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0057 | |
2023-02-22 | House | Concur:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-21 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-15 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-01 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2023-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |