WY HB0225 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - 3rd Reading:Failed 27-32-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - 3rd Reading:Failed 27-32-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to gaming; authorizing online sports wagering; providing for regulation; requiring rulemaking; providing for the collection of revenues; creating penalties; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Gaming governance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 27-32-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 27-32-1-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-12-3-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |