WY HB0225 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - President Signed HEA No. 0067
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - President Signed HEA No. 0067
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to brands; excepting livestock from brand inspection on change of ownership as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Transfer of ownership of livestock and brands.
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Mark Semlek [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. John Hines [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0067 |
2013-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0067 |
2013-02-20 | Assigned Number HEA0067 | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-01 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-31 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |