WY HB0218 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring the board of land commissioners to promulgate notice and public comment requirements for proposed land exchanges as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State land exchanges-notice and posting.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Clausen [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Cyrus Western [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] |
Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-21 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 56-3-1-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |