WY HB0209 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to food and drugs; establishing licensing requirements and procedures for the production, testing and sale of marijuana; generally providing for the regulation of marijuana-related activities; prohibiting discrimination based on marijuana activities; specifying private rights to prohibit activities involving marijuana; providing for the local regulation of marijuana as specified; establishing offenses and civil penalties for the possession of specified amounts of marijuana and marijuana products; amending criminal penalties for the possession of marijuana as specified; establishing additional offenses related to marijuana; imposing taxes on marijuana and providing for the distribution of tax revenues; defining terms; making conforming amendments; repealing obsolete provisions; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Regulation of marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-17 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-02 | Bill Number Assigned |