WY HB0203 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the administration of government and health insurance exchanges and related functions under federal law; providing for a select legislative committee and a study and report; providing duties of the select committee and specified state agencies; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health benefit exchange study and select committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-27 - Senate - S Adopted HB0203JC01 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - H Adopted HB0203JC01 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0119
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0119
2013-02-27 Assigned Number HEA0119
2013-02-27SenateAdopted HB0203JC01
2013-02-27HouseAdopted HB0203JC01
2013-02-26SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-25HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-25HouseDid Not Concur
2013-02-25HouseReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-25 Amendment Failed
2013-02-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-21SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-02-11SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-11SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-02-08SenateRereferred to S02
2013-02-08SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-08SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-02-01SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10
2013-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-31HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-29HousePassed CoW
2013-01-29 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-29HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-25HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-25HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-24HouseRereferred to H02
2013-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-24HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-21HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10
2013-01-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback