WY HB0192 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - President Signed HEA No. 0051
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - President Signed HEA No. 0051
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the legislature; providing that communications audible on an official recording or broadcast of an interim committee meeting or other meeting are not confidential and privileged as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Legislator communications on recordings and broadcasts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 13-0-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 13-0-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0051 |
2018-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0051 |
2018-03-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0051 | |
2018-03-08 | House | Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 13-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules 59-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |