WY HB0163 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; modifying the definition of "residence" for purposes of elections of and candidates for the offices of United States senator and member of congress; modifying nomination application requirements and affirmations accordingly; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal congressional elections-residency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21 Assigned Chapter Number 167
2021-04-21 Became Law without Signature
2021-04-06SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0080
2021-04-06HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0080
2021-04-06 Assigned Number HEA No. 0080
2021-04-06HouseConcur:Passed 57-0-3-0-0
2021-04-06HouseReceived for Concurrence
2021-04-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2021-04-02Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-04-01SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-31SenateCOW:Laid Back
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-30SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-03-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2021-03-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-17House3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
2021-03-12House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-11HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-05HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-05HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2021-03-01HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-02-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback