WY HB0163 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; prohibiting a noncompete provision for a physician's employment, partnership or other business agreement; prescribing enforcement of other contract provisions; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician noncompete clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - COW:Failed 5-24-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-14-3-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07Senatepostponed indefinitely
2018-03-07SenateCOW:Failed 5-24-1-0-0
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on General File
2018-03-06SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2018-03-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 43-14-3-0-0
2018-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-16HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-16HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2018-02-15House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 58-1-1-0-0
2018-02-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback