WY HB0161 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to abortions; prohibiting abortions based on selective reasons and disabilities as specified; providing definitions; providing a criminal penalty and disciplinary sanctions for violations; imposing civil liability as specified; making conforming amendments; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human life equality-prohibiting discriminatory abortions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateCOW:S Did not consider for COW
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-31SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-03-26SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2021-03-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-24House3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0
2021-03-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-22HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-18HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-18HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2021-03-01HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-02-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback