WY HB0155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public utilities; requiring consideration of reliability factors before approving the closure of an electric generation facility; specifying applicability; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Electric generation-reliability.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 |
2021-03-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-26 | Bill Number Assigned |