WY HB0146 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to labor and employment; amending penalties for violations of equal pay provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Equal pay-penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 57-1-2-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |