WY HB0144 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; allowing a motion for a new trial for persons convicted of a felony based upon newly discovered evidence of actual innocence; specifying requirements, procedures and conditions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
New trial based on actual innocence.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Rep. William Pownall [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-20 | House | Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-20 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |