WY HB0144 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; removing the time limitation for the guarantee program for school district bonds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School district bonds.
Sponsors
Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Rep. John Freeman [D] | Sen. John Hastert [D] | Rep. Carl Loucks [R] |
Rep. Mary Throne [D] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - 04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - 04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Rereferred to S09; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-01 | 04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-14 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2011-01-14 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |