WY HB0135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to economic development; creating the general regulatory sandbox program; authorizing limited waivers of statutes and rules under specified conditions; establishing standards and procedures for sandbox applications, operations and supervision; specifying standards for the suspension and revocation of sandbox authorization; providing definitions; requiring rulemaking; requiring reporting; and providing for effective dates.
Title
General regulatory sandbox program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-22 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 41-18-1-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |