WY HB0126 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; providing for the use of physical force against a trespasser as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Trespass-removal of trespasser.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-5-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-5-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-09 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-5-0-0-0 |
2023-02-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |