WY HB0126 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to agriculture; establishing the offense of interference with an agricultural operation; providing immunity for reporting cruelty to livestock as specified; providing for assistance by livestock board; providing definitions; providing a penalty; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture operations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenateCommittee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2013-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05
2013-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-02-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-05 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-04HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-04 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-01HouseLaid Back Pursuant to HR 7-3
2013-01-31HousePassed CoW
2013-01-31 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-31HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-29HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05
2013-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback