WY HB0124 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 37 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 37 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Trust Code; amending and creating a definition relating to interested persons; providing for distribution of trust assets as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Uniform Trust Code amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 37 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0028 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0028 |
2017-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0028 |
2017-02-14 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0028 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-08 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-25 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-18 | House | Rerefer to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |