WY HB0123 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to probate; removing the maximum value for ancillary procedures relating to probate of estates of nonresidents; amending filing requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Probate-estates of nonresidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - Concur:Failed 0-60-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - Concur:Failed 0-60-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Concur:Failed 0-60-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-02-14 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-02-14 | House | Concur:Failed 0-60-0-0-0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-08 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-26 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-18 | House | Rerefer to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |