WY HB0119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; providing that a capable patient with a terminal disease may request prescription of self-administered medication for the purpose of hastening death; providing that patients have a right to information as specified; specifying duties and responsibilities of physicians as specified; specifying waiting periods and residency requirements; specifying the effect of the act on insurance policies; providing immunities for participation in the act; specifying limitations; providing definitions; granting rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Death with dignity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0119.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0119.pdf |