WY HB0116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicle franchises; modifying a provision relating to claims made by new vehicle dealers as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New vehicle dealer claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 89
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0071
2019-02-22SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0071
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0071
2019-02-21 Assigned Number HEA No. 0071
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28House3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0
2019-01-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback