WY HB0111 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; adding fentanyl to the list of controlled substances that qualify as a child endangerment offense; clarifying the applicability of provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Endangering children-fentanyl.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-3-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-2-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-2-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 10 | |
2023-02-15 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0002 | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0002 |
2023-02-13 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0002 |
2023-02-09 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0002 | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-03 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-2-1-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |