WY HB0105 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to welfare; creating the achieving a better life experience program for individuals with disabilities; specifying program requirements; establishing a trust; specifying the state treasurer as trustee; providing for general powers of the trustee; providing rulemaking authority; excluding the program from benefit eligibility determinations as specified; providing limitations; providing for appointment of financial institutions as managers of the program; providing duties of managers of the program; providing definitions; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABLE Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - Senate - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House of Representatives - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House of Representatives - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House of Representatives - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House of Representatives - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House of Representatives - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House of Representatives - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-29SenateCOW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2016-02-26SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2016-02-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2016-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-16HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-16 H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education 56-2-2-0-0
2016-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback