WY HB0103 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to abortions; establishing additional requirements for abortion reporting; providing for a public report of abortion statistics; authorizing the board of medicine to investigate and discipline specified conduct; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Reporting of abortions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 46-12-2-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 179 | |
2019-03-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0116 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0116 |
2019-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0116 |
2019-02-26 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0116 | |
2019-02-26 | House | Concur:Passed 46-12-2-0-0 |
2019-02-26 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-20 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-31 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |