WY HB0103 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to abortions; establishing additional requirements for abortion reporting; providing for a public report of abortion statistics; authorizing the board of medicine to investigate and discipline specified conduct; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting of abortions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 46-12-2-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 179
2019-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0116
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0116
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0116
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEA No. 0116
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 46-12-2-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-20SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-31HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback