WY HB0102 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Bonner, Connolly and Petroff Nayes: Representative(s) Botten, Davison, Jaggi, McKim, McOmie and Shepperson Ayes 3 Nays 6 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Bonner, Connolly and Petroff Nayes: Representative(s) Botten, Davison, Jaggi, McKim, McOmie and Shepperson Ayes 3 Nays 6 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state common school trust land revenues; funding the management of state common school trust lands from state common school trust land revenues as specified; creating an account; providing for a continuous appropriation; providing for reports; providing for a sunset; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State common school trust land management account.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Kathy Davison [R] | Sen. Gerald Geis [R] | Rep. Carl Loucks [R] |
Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Bonner, Connolly and Petroff Nayes: Representative(s) Botten, Davison, Jaggi, McKim, McOmie and Shepperson Ayes 3 Nays 6 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-13 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0102.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0102.pdf |