WY HB0100 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; authorizing adults to possess and use hemp extract; eliminating registration requirements; authorizing a parent or legal guardian to administer hemp extract to a minor or vulnerable adult; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Use of hemp extracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-16 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |