WY HB0100 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 30 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 HB0100JC01/AA HB0100JC01 Delete the following Senate amendments: HB0100S2001/A Further amend as follows: Page 1-line 3 After "easement" insert "as specified". Page 1-line 8 Delete "(a)(iii)(intro)" insert "(b) by creating a new paragraph (iii)". Page 1-lines 13 through 16 Delete and insert: "(b) Notwithstanding subsection (a) of this section: (iii) The commission shall not assert any claim based upon adverse possession or a prescriptive easement as a basis to acquire any interest in real property. Provided, however, that the commission may assert a claim of adverse possession or prescriptive easement as a basis f
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 30 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 HB0100JC01/AA HB0100JC01 Delete the following Senate amendments: HB0100S2001/A Further amend as follows: Page 1-line 3 After "easement" insert "as specified". Page 1-line 8 Delete "(a)(iii)(intro)" insert "(b) by creating a new paragraph (iii)". Page 1-lines 13 through 16 Delete and insert: "(b) Notwithstanding subsection (a) of this section: (iii) The commission shall not assert any claim based upon adverse possession or a prescriptive easement as a basis to acquire any interest in real property. Provided, however, that the commission may assert a claim of adverse possession or prescriptive easement as a basis f
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; prohibiting the acquisition of lands by the game and fish commission through adverse possession or proscriptive easement; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game & fish-land acquisition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 30 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 HB0100JC01/AA HB0100JC01 Delete the following Senate amendments: HB0100S2001/A Further amend as follows: Page 1-line 3 After "easement" insert "as specified". Page 1-line 8 Delete "(a)(iii)(intro)" insert "(b) by creating a new paragraph (iii)". Page 1-lines 13 through 16 Delete and insert: "(b) Notwithstanding subsection (a) of this section: (iii) The commission shall not assert any claim based upon adverse possession or a prescriptive easement as a basis to acquire any interest in real property. Provided, however, that the commission may assert a claim of adverse possession or prescriptive easement as a basis f | |
2011-03-02 | (S) Adopted HB0100JC01 | |
2011-03-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Patton, Peasley, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Brown and Gingery. Excused: Representative(s) Pederson Absent: Representative(s) Nicholas B Ayes 56 Nays 2 Excused 1 Absent 1 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Adopted HB0100JC01 | |
2011-02-25 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2011-02-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Childers Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis and Zwonitzer, Dn.. Excused: Representative(s) Gay, Greear, Pederson and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Ayes 1 Nays 55 Excused 4 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Did Not Concur | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Jennings and Rothfuss. Ayes 28 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-25 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Burns, Dockstader and Driskill Nayes: Senator(s) Esquibel, F. Excused: Senator(s) Christensen Ayes 3 Nays 1 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-01 | (S06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-20 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish and Wallis. Nays: Representative(s) Blake, Brown, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Gay and Goggles. Ayes 54 Nays 4 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-17 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Bonner, Botten, Connolly, Davison, Jaggi, McKim, McOmie, Petroff and Shepperson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-17 | (H06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0100.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0100.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Enroll/HB0100.pdf |