WY HB0095 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-32-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-32-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties, cities and towns; prohibiting counties, cities and towns from enacting and enforcing policies on the use of animals as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Working animal protection act.
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Rep. Sarah Penn [R] | Rep. Rachel Rodriguez-Williams [R] | Sen. Tim French [R] |
Sen. Dan Laursen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-32-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-31 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 30-32-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-31 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |