WY HB0091 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to civil and criminal procedure; providing a privilege as specified for journalists who refuse to disclose news information; specifying applicability; allowing for exceptions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
News source shield law.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. William Henderson [R] | Rep. Karlee Provenza [D] | Rep. Daniel Singh [R] |
Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2023-01-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |