WY HB0091 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties; amending the salaries of specified county officers; repealing obsolete salary language; and providing for an effective date.
Title
County officers-salaries.
Sponsors
Rep. John Eklund [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Mark Kinner [R] |
Rep. Joe MacGuire [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. John Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Concur:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-17-0-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-17-0-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Assigned Chapter Number 110 | |
2022-03-25 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0056 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0056 |
2022-03-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0056 |
2022-03-10 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0056 | |
2022-03-10 | House | Concur:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-07 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 |
2022-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2022-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-17-0-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |